NH HB153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 189; Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 189; Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the telecommunications planning and development advisory committee.
Title
Relative to the telecommunications planning and development advisory committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 189; Effective 7/6/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2135 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2129EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1991 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2129e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1345s (Rep Introne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1814 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1345s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1345s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1345s, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1345s, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 318 |
2015-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 11 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 182 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 209 |