NH HB1526 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to possession of less than one-half ounce of marijuana.
Title
Relative to possession of less than one-half ounce of marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - OTP/AM 0593H(NT) (Y: 162 N: 161 NV: 23 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12, Pg.422 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/2/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Introduced 3/7/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7, Pg.187 | |
2012-03-08 | House Reconsideration (Rep Comerford): Motion Failed Division Vote 140-184; House Journal 23, PG.1412 | |
2012-03-08 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0593h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 162-161 | |
2012-03-08 | House Amendment #0593h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1409-1410 | |
2012-02-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0593h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.1006-1007 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0593h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1088 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-12-13 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG. 358 |