NH HB1526 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0112
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0112
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to establish a methodology for determining certain high cost long-term care cases.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to establish a methodology for determining certain high cost long-term care cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | House Signed by the Governor 06/01/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0112 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1879 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1879 Adopted; House Journal 38, PG.1916 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/28/10; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Hearing: April 20, 2010, Room 103, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11, Pg.264 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0681h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1142 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0681h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1142 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0681h; House Calendar 17, PG.897-898 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0681h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 17, PG.803 | |
2010-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-02-09 | House =CANCELLED= Executive Session: 2/9/2010 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2010 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-01-20 | House Public Hearing: 2/4/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.243 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2315&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |