NH HB1524 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0999h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to post-arrest photo distribution by law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to post-arrest photo distribution by law enforcement officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0999h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0999h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0999h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 10
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary)
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-02-19House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback