NH HB152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 80; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 80; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the apportionment of costs in cooperative school districts.
Title
Relative to the apportionment of costs in cooperative school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 80; Eff: 08/17/2021 |
2021-06-11 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 19 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 7 |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/09/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97054508060 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 37 |