NH HB1519 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study class IV resources under the renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Establishing a committee to study class IV resources under the renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 29 |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 25 |