NH HB1517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statewide education property tax and excess revenue from games of chance.
Title
Relative to the statewide education property tax and excess revenue from games of chance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 196 N: 184 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 19 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 78 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-184 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 75 |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/14/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 23 |