NH HB1516 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 07/01/2010; Chapter 0235
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 07/01/2010; Chapter 0235
Summary
Relative to funding the Claremont, Colebrook, Milford, and Keene District Courts in fiscal year 2011.
Title
Relative to funding the Claremont, Colebrook, Milford, and Keene District Courts in fiscal year 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bergin [R] | Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Cynthia Dokmo [R] | Rep. Sandra Harris [D] |
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 07/01/2010; Chapter 0235 | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2231 Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2231; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2231; Senate Amendment, Filed | |
2010-05-27 | House Conferee Change: Rep Davis Replaces Rep Anderson; House Journal 46, PG.2247 | |
2010-05-25 | House Conferee Change: Rep Baroody(CH) Replaces Rep Leishman; House Journal 46, PG.2246 | |
2010-05-20 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/25/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Kelly, Janeway and Odell | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-04-14 | House Speaker Appoints Reps Leishman, Anderson, L.Weber & Keans; House Journal 32, PG.1587 | |
2010-04-14 | House House Non Concurs with Senate Amendment #1253s, Request Comm of Conf (Rep M.Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1587 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.283 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1253s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.281 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 1253s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.281 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of the Calendar; Senate Journal 13, Pg.275 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1253s, 4/7/10; Senate Calendar 14A | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Hearing: April 1, 2010, Room 100, State House, 11:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance, Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2010-02-17 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0470h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.983-984 | |
2010-02-17 | House Amendment #0470h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.983-984 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Beginning of Feb 17 Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-04 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0470h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.571-572 | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0470h (New Title) for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (vote 23-1); House Calendar 13, PG.536 | |
2010-01-28 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-28 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Full Committee Work Session: 1/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 6, PG.243 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2168&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |