NH HB1506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study ways to reduce texting while driving.
Title
Establishing a commission to study ways to reduce texting while driving.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] | Rep. JP Marzullo [R] |
Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0911h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0911h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0911h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 31 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 24 |