NH HB1506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 248; Eff. 6/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the commission on primary care workforce issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Sen. Gray Floor Amendment 1504s (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 248; Eff. 6/12/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1275s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1275s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateSen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2018-1504s, Regular Calendar 8Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1275s, Division Vote 10Y-8N, Amendment Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1275s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-05SenateSpecial Order to 04/19/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/05/2018 Senate Journal 11
2018-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1275s, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/28/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0251h: Motion Adopted DV 215-108 03/06/2018 House Journal 7 P. 30
2018-03-07HouseAmendment # 2018-0251h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 7 P. 22
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0251h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 55
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback