NH HB1500 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the rate of the communications services tax and repealing the tax in 2025.
Title
Reducing the rate of the communications services tax and repealing the tax in 2025.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick White [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] | Rep. Brian Seaworth [R] |
Rep. Tim Baxter [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |