NH HB1497 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 185; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 185; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accountability for school performance.
Title
Relative to accountability for school performance.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 185; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1825e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1825e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0750h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0750h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0750h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 13 |