NH HB1495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale of over-the-counter rape test kits.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of over-the-counter rape test kits.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Samantha Fox [D] |
Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Safiya Wazir [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0909h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 123 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0909h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 123 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0909h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 39 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24 |