NH HB1493 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 118; 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 118; 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the drug forfeiture fund.
Title
Relative to the drug forfeiture fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 118; 07/26/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0085h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0085h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0085h (Vote ; 20-0) |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 11:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |