NH HB1490 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - House II Remainder Effective as Provided in Section 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - House II Remainder Effective as Provided in Section 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshires regional greenhouse gas initiative cap and trade program for controlling carbon dioxide emissions.
Title
Relative to New Hampshires regional greenhouse gas initiative cap and trade program for controlling carbon dioxide emissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2375 (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - C OF C #2375C (Y: 211 N: 74 NV: 36 Abs: 73) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - C OF C #2375C (Y: 211 N: 74 NV: 36 Abs: 73) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | House II Remainder Effective as Provided in Section 17 | |
2012-06-25 | House I. Section 1-10 and 16-17 Effective 01/01/2013 | |
2012-06-25 | House Law Without Signature 06/23/2012; Chapter 0281; NH Constitution, Article 44, Part II | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2509e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.2613 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment 2509 Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2375c Adopted, Regular Calendar 211-74; House Journal 51, PG.2602-2603 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2375c; Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Adopted | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2375c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-30 | House Conferee Change: Rep Tucker Replaces Rep Levasseur; House Journal 47, PG.2507 | |
2012-05-30 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Odell Replaces Senator Merrill | |
2012-05-24 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/25/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 304)== | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Lambert, and Merrill | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Odell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps J.Garrity, Holden, W.O'Connor, and Levasseur; House Journal 44, PG.2348 | |
2012-05-16 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1872s and Request C of C (Rep J.Garrity): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2348 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1872s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.471 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee Amendment 1872s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.443 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1872s, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/12, Rooms 305-307, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m. | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9, Pg.334 | |
2012-03-28 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1390h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1791-1792 | |
2012-03-28 | House Floor Amendment #2012-1390h(NT) (Rep J.Garrity): Amendment Adopted Division Vote 237-110; House Journal 30, PG.1792 | |
2012-03-28 | House Laid On The Table (Rep Kaen): Motion Failed Division Vote 103-228; House Journal 30, PG.1792 | |
2012-03-28 | House Special Order to Next Bill: Without Objection; House Journal 30, PG.1789 | |
2012-03-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 25, PG.1513-1514 | |
2012-03-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 28 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.1513-1514 | |
2012-03-14 | House Executive Session: 3/20/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-02-22 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/6/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-02-15 | House Suspend House Rules to Allow Reporting Deadline be Moved to March 22, 2012 (Rep J.Garrity): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.908 | |
2012-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 10:15 Amendment Representatives Hall | |
2011-12-01 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 7, PG. 357 |