NH HB1480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to objections to proposed agency administrative rules by standing committees of the general court.
Title
Relative to objections to proposed agency administrative rules by standing committees of the general court.
Sponsors
Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. William O'Brien [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-18 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |