NC H228 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Ch. SL 2024-28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Ch. SL 2024-28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rev. Laws Tech., Clarifying, & Admin. Chngs
Title
Rev. Laws Tech., Clarifying, & Admin. Chngs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Ch. SL 2024-28 | |
2024-07-01 | Signed by Gov. 7/1/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Ratified | |
2024-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-27 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2024-06-24 | House | Ruled Material |
2024-06-20 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2024-06-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2024-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2024 |
2024-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2024 |
2024-05-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2024 |
2024-05-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-05-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-05-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2024-05-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-15 | House | Ruled Material |
2024-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S174 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Ch. SL 2023-12
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporate Income
Corporations
Debtor & Creditor
Definitions
Dhhs
Dmv
Excise
Fees
Fines & Penalties
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
For-profit
Fuel
Fuels
Health
Health Services
Hospitals
Individual Income
Insurance
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Medicaid
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Partnerships
Personnel
Poverty
Presented
Property
Public
Ratified
Real Estate
Records
Retailing
Sales & Use
Session Laws
Social Services
Sports
Statute Of Limitations
Tax Collection
Tax Credits
Tax Returns
Taxation
Taxes
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Trucks
Commerce
Corporate Income
Corporations
Debtor & Creditor
Definitions
Dhhs
Dmv
Excise
Fees
Fines & Penalties
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
For-profit
Fuel
Fuels
Health
Health Services
Hospitals
Individual Income
Insurance
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Medicaid
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Partnerships
Personnel
Poverty
Presented
Property
Public
Ratified
Real Estate
Records
Retailing
Sales & Use
Session Laws
Social Services
Sports
Statute Of Limitations
Tax Collection
Tax Credits
Tax Returns
Taxation
Taxes
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Trucks
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 113.83 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 129 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 130.17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 153.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 153.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 155 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 160.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 160.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 164.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 164.4H | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 164.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 236 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 241.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 449.45 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 145.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 146.9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 147.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 147.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 147.9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
122A | 8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 79.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
24 | 1.1E | (n/a) | Citation Text |