NH HB1472 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 181; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state building code provisions for energy conservation in new building construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state building code provisions for energy conservation in new building construction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 181; Eff. 8/7/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-12SenateHearing: 04/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-1416s; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-12SenateHearing: 04/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0092h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 10
2018-02-22HouseAmendment # 2018-0092h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 10
2018-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0092h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback