NH HB1470 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that all ballot counting devices show the number of overvotes for each race on the ballot.
Title
Requiring that all ballot counting devices show the number of overvotes for each race on the ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |