NH HB1470 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - House Signed by the Governor 7/20/2010; Chapter 322, Effective: 7/20/2010
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - House Signed by the Governor 7/20/2010; Chapter 322, Effective: 7/20/2010
Summary
Establishing a committee to study laws relating to condominium and homeowners' associations.
Title
Establishing a committee to study laws relating to condominium and homeowners' associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Paul Hackel [D] | Rep. Suzanne Harvey [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | House Signed by the Governor 7/20/2010; Chapter 322, Effective: 7/20/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #2023s (Rep Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2224 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.498 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.422 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Committee Amendment 2023s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.422 | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023s, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19A | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === May 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Hearing: May 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 11, Pg.263 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0541h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20 PG.1121-1122 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0541h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20 PG.1121-1122 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0541h; House Calendar 17, PG.892 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0541h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 17, PG.795 | |
2010-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2010 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2010 9:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.241 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2229&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |