NH HB147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 05/16/2013; Chapter 0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 05/16/2013; Chapter 0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a duty of the assessing standards board concerning municipal reimbursement for the cost of assessments.
Title
Repealing a duty of the assessing standards board concerning municipal reimbursement for the cost of assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 05/16/2013; Chapter 0018 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/27/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m. Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-06 | House | Declination of Referral Under House Rule 46(f) (Rep Wallner); House Journal 16, PG.321 |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 16, PG.303 |
2013-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0044h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.303 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment #0044h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.303 |
2013-01-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0044h (New Title); House Calendar 11, PG.172 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0044h(NT) for Feb 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.152 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.184 |