NH HB1462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the eviction process.
Title
Relative to the eviction process.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Terrio [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1310 | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1069 | |
2012-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-24 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-11 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/19/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-12-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG. 356 |