NH HB1459 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to court proceedings in civil actions.
Title
Relative to court proceedings in civil actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1069 | |
2012-02-08 | House Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment #2012-0402h(NT): 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-01-31 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-11 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG. 356 |