NH HB1458 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting harassing or intimidating court filings in family court proceedings.
Title
Limiting harassing or intimidating court filings in family court proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. JD Bernardy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Greeson [R] |
Rep. Diane Langley [D] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |