NH HB1458 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.978
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.978
Summary
Relative to driver's license suspensions.
Title
Relative to driver's license suspensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.978 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 13, PG.534 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 6, PG.240 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2123&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |