NH HB1457 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207'
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207'
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a code of professional ethics for New Hampshire teachers.
Title
Establishing a code of professional ethics for New Hampshire teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. John Balcom [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207' |
2016-08-22 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 08/30/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-05-10 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-04-19 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 04/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 20 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 11 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-22 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 15 |