NH HB1451 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of contracts relative to official ballot default budgets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of contracts relative to official ballot default budgets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 68
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/25/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback