NH HB1432 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Birdsell Refused to Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Birdsell Refused to Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of state funds for a certain passenger rail project.
Title
Prohibiting the use of state funds for a certain passenger rail project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - OTP (Y: 187 N: 144 NV: 27 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 182 NV: 24 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 182 NV: 24 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Refused to Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1837s and Requests CofC (Reps. McConkey, Milz, B. Boyd, Fedolfi): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1837s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1837s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1837s, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17A |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 187-144 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Lay HB1432 on Table (Rep. O'Brien): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-182 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2022 11:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Public Works and Highways |