NH HB1429 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing licensure for massage establishments.
Title
Establishing licensure for massage establishments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2022 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |