NH HB1419 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 184-158 02/16/2022 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 184-158 02/16/2022 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a New Hampshire civilian climate corps advisory commission.
Title
Relative to establishing a New Hampshire civilian climate corps advisory commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 184-158 02/16/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |