NH HB1419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biennial motorcycle inspections.
Title
Relative to biennial motorcycle inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 115 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 49 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 10 |