NH HB1419 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - House Signed By Governor 06/13/2012; Effective 06/13/2012; Chapter 0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - House Signed By Governor 06/13/2012; Effective 06/13/2012; Chapter 0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rights of military parents.
Title
Relative to the rights of military parents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | House Signed By Governor 06/13/2012; Effective 06/13/2012; Chapter 0213 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2609 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-30 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #2103s (Rep Moran): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 47, PG.2498 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2103s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.588 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 2103s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.515 | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-2103s, 5/16/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Hearing: 4/30/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16A | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7, Pg.186 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0984h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1285 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0984h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1285 | |
2012-02-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0984h; House Calendar 17, PG.994 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0984h for Mar 7 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1054 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/23/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-02-15 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/23/2012 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 7, PG.355 |