NH HB1413 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring lobbyist forms submitted in writing to be legible.
Title
Requiring lobbyist forms submitted in writing to be legible.
Sponsors
Rep. Werner Horn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 11 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 21 |