NH HB1412 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to court reporters.
Title
Relative to court reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 166 NV: 17 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Reconsider HB1412 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 107 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0901h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-166 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 77 |
2024-03-07 | House | FLAM # 2024-0901h (Rep. Lynn): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 77 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/15/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25 |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 19 |