NH HB1410 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of flavors in vaping products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of flavors in vaping products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 143 NV: 19 Abs: 42) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0723h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-143 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0723h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0723h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 37
2020-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2020 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback