NH HB1405 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the installation of wireless electric utility meters.
Title
Relative to the installation of wireless electric utility meters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 29 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 21 |