NH HB1405 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Sen. Soucy Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Sen. Soucy Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Title
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 184 N: 119 NV: 43 Abs: 46) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study Not Voted On; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Remove HB 1405 from the Consent Calendar |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:35 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0219h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-119 |
2014-02-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #0219h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0219h for Feb 19 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307==Continued== |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307==Recessed== |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |