NH HB1404 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consumer rights regarding towing of vehicles.
Title
Relative to consumer rights regarding towing of vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |