NH HB140 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming January 24 as "Granny D" day.
Title
Proclaiming January 24 as "Granny D" day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-02-01 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Wheeler, Monteil, Horrigan, Gerhard, Yokela, A. Lekas, H. Howard, T. Lekas, Read, A. Murray) 02/01/2023 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB140 01/11/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/11/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |