NH HB1395 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to perform an audit of billing practices under the Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to perform an audit of billing practices under the Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |