NH HB1390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to ballots and verification counts of machine-counted ballots.
Title
Relative to access to ballots and verification counts of machine-counted ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Interim Study (Y: 219 N: 105 NV: 21 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-12 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-105 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 66 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 10 P. 51 |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 51 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 (if not exec'd on the 3rd) |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 20 |