NH HB1380 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the operation of personal water craft around the marshlands or flats of the Rye estuary and the New Castle back channel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the operation of personal water craft around the marshlands or flats of the Rye estuary and the New Castle back channel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0887h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0887h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0887h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 26
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-02-13HouseFull Commitee Work Session: 02/18/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-02-05House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback