NH HB1380 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0303
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0303
Summary
Relative to assessing fees by zoning boards of adjustment.
Title
Relative to assessing fees by zoning boards of adjustment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0303 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2218 Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2218; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Adopted | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2218; Senate Amendment, Filed | |
2010-05-27 | House Conferee Change: Rep Davis Replaces Rep Katsakiores; House Journal 46, PG.2247 | |
2010-05-24 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/26/2010 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Houde, DeVries and Roberge | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. DeVries Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Kidder, Walz, Stetson & Katsakiores; House Journal 42, PG.2155 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment & Requests Comm of Conf (Rep G.Richardson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.2155 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 17, Pg.399 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1750s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.396 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment 1750s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.396 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1750s, 5/5/10; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Hearing: April 1, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs, Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2010-03-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0148h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-107; House Journal 24, PG.1298-1299 | |
2010-03-10 | House Special Order to First Order of Business on Mar 11 Calendar (Rep Gandia): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1293 | |
2010-03-10 | House Amendment #0148h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1293 | |
2010-02-11 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 19, PG.1034-1035 | |
2010-02-11 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #0148h; House Calendar 19, PG.1049 | |
2010-02-11 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0148h for Mar 10 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19 PG1034-1035 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 (Continued 2/11/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 If Necessary) | |
2010-01-19 | House Subcommittee Members Include: Reps Kidder (Chair), M.Allen, Butterworth, Lyons, & Stetson | |
2010-01-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-16 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Local and Regulated Revenues; House Journal 6, PG.238 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2481&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |