NH HB1367 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the public utility commission's authority to implement measures to increase the reliability, cost effectiveness, efficiency, or resiliency of the electrical grid.
Title
Relative to the public utility commission's authority to implement measures to increase the reliability, cost effectiveness, efficiency, or resiliency of the electrical grid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 64 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 40 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 4 P. 11 |