NH HB1361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 207-131 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 207-131 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a penalty for any person who transports a controlled drug into New Hampshire with the intent to distribute.
Title
Establishing a penalty for any person who transports a controlled drug into New Hampshire with the intent to distribute.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 207-131 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0087h: Motion Failed DV 153-187 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0087h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-02-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0087h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 10:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |