NH HB136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB136
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 194-163 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 194-163 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Requiring schools to update documents and software to include the option of identifying a student as non-binary.
Title
Requiring schools to update documents and software to include the option of identifying a student as non-binary.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] |
Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 194-163 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB136 10/14/2021 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 27 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97054508060 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 36 |
Same As/Similar To
HB136 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=470&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB136 |