NH HB1357 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.931
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.931
Summary
Requiring funds for the purchase of modular or manufactured housing to be held in escrow until an occupancy permit is issued and relative to the development of a manufactured housing buyer's guide.
Title
Requiring funds for the purchase of modular or manufactured housing to be held in escrow until an occupancy permit is issued and relative to the development of a manufactured housing buyer's guide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.931 | |
2010-02-05 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 18-0); House Calendar 14, PG.580 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-25 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 (Members: Reps Nord, Hunt & McEachern) | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/21/2010 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-12-16 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.237 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2366&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |