NH HB1356 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 05/02/2012; Chapter 0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 05/02/2012; Chapter 0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Classifying certain land in Litchfield as land to be retained by the state.
Title
Classifying certain land in Litchfield as land to be retained by the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Gandia [R] | Rep. Robert Haefner [R] | Rep. George Lambert [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 05/02/2012; Chapter 0034 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.383 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.349 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/11/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7, Pg.186 | |
2012-02-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.925 | |
2012-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.691 | |
2012-01-12 | House Executive Session: 1/31/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 =(If Necessary Continued 2/2/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305)= | |
2012-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 7, PG.352 |