NH HB1352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal budget meetings.
Title
Relative to municipal budget meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 56 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 25 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 19 |