NH HB1347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1347 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1347 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensing requirements for health care facilities that operate on a membership-based business model.
Title
Relative to licensing requirements for health care facilities that operate on a membership-based business model.
Sponsors
Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Louise Andrus [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] |
Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Melissa Blasek [R] | Rep. Dawn Johnson [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Lay HB1347 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0996h (NT) (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2022 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |